Mathis v. Boomtown Casino-Bossier City

Plaintiff: John-Talmage Mathis
Defendant: Boomtown Casino-Bossier City
Case Number: 5:2011cv01909
Filed: October 27, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Presiding Judge: Tom Stagg
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2013 110 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute. A judgment consistent with the terms of this memorandum ruling shall issue herewith. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 8/16/13. (crt,Delgado, S)
April 8, 2013 104 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: IT IS ORDERED that the motion for summary judgment filed by Boomtown 95 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Boomtown's motion is granted to the extent that Boomtown is not liable to Mathis for twenty-three hours of unpaid wages; otherwise, Boomtown's motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 4/8/2013. (crt,Joffrion, B)
April 4, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John-Talmage Mathis, 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Boomtown Casino-Bossier City. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 4/4/2012. (crt,Keifer, K)
January 5, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; adopting 13 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 1/5/2012. (crt,Keifer, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathis v. Boomtown Casino-Bossier City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John-Talmage Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boomtown Casino-Bossier City
Represented By: Curtis Ray Joseph, Jr
Represented By: Ronald F Lattier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?