Conner v. Kraemer Shows Oilfield Services L L C

Plaintiff: Michael Conner
Defendant: Noram Drilling Co, Kraemer Shows Oilfield Services L L C and Exco Resources Inc
Case Number: 5:2011cv02206
Filed: December 23, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: DeSoto
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 65 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 8/27/2013. (crt,Dauterive, C)
June 11, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: IT IS ORDERED that 46 motion for summary judgment filed by Exco Resources Inc. is hereby GRANTED. All claims by Michael Conner against Exco are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 6/10/2013. (crt,Joffrion, B)
October 4, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 4 First MOTION to Remand filed by Michael Conner, 22 Memorandum Ruling Regarding Motion to Remand, and 24 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 23 Order on Motion to Remand filed by Exco Re sources Inc. The Memorandum Ruling (Doc 22 ) is VACATED, the Motion to Remand (Doc No 4 ) is DENIED, and the Appeal (Doc No 24 ) is TERMINATED AS MOOT. The court will set a scheduling conference in the near future to discuss a trial date and related deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/04/12. (crt,Yocum, M)
July 9, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 4 First MOTION to Remand filed by Michael Conner. The Motion to Remand is granted and, subject to the stay set forth in the accompanying order, the case is remanded to the 42nd Judicial District Court, DeSoto Parish, Louisiana, where it was pending as Civil Action No. 73194. The 11 MOTION to Strike filed by Exco Resources Inc is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/9/2012. (crt,Dauterive, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conner v. Kraemer Shows Oilfield Services L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noram Drilling Co
Represented By: Elizabeth M Carmody
Represented By: Sidney Earl Cook, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraemer Shows Oilfield Services L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exco Resources Inc
Represented By: Crews Reynolds LeBlanc, Jr
Represented By: Martin E Golden
Represented By: Stephen Whitlow
Represented By: John Powers Wolff, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Conner
Represented By: Brent J Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?