Langston v. Louisiana State Penitentiary

Plaintiff: Jesse Langston
Defendant: Warden Louisiana State Penitentiary
Case Number: 5:2012cv00362
Filed: February 2, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: West Feliciana
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Presiding Judge: Tom Stagg
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying without prejudice 70 Motion to Reopen Time to File Appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/19/2015. (crt,Williams, L)
March 30, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT concurring with the findings re 54 Report and Recommendations; denying 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jesse Langston. The court denies a certificate of appealability because the applicant has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a a constitutional right. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 3/28/2015. (crt,Keifer, K)
September 18, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 19 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 18 Order on Motion to Stay, filed by Jesse Langston. Langston has not shown good cause for his failure to exhaust the claims. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Hornsby's order (R.Doc. 18 ) is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 9/17/2013. (crt,Haik, K) Modified on 9/18/2013 to correct file date (Haik, K).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langston v. Louisiana State Penitentiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Louisiana State Penitentiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?