Top Dollar Pawn, Gun and Car Audio #5 L L C v. Caddo Parish et al

Plaintiff: Top Dollar Pawn Gun & Car Audio #5 L L C
Defendant: Willie L Shaw, Jr, Steve Prator, Charles R Scott, Terri Scott and Caddo Parish
Case Number: 5:2012cv00577
Filed: March 6, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2014 146 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 122 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 123 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 125 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 09/10/2014. (crt,McDonnell, D)
October 10, 2013 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 80 MOTION to Dismiss Willie L. Shaw, Jr., in his individual capacity filed by Willie L Shaw, Jr. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 10/10/2013. (crt,McDonnell, D)
March 14, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 45 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Charles R. Scott filed by Charles R Scott. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 3/14/2013. (crt,McDonnell, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Top Dollar Pawn, Gun and Car Audio #5 L L C v. Caddo Parish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie L Shaw, Jr
Represented By: Ansel Martin Stroud, III
Represented By: Jennifer P McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Prator
Represented By: Edwin H Byrd, III
Represented By: Nichole Marie Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles R Scott
Represented By: John S Hodge
Represented By: John M Madison, Jr
Represented By: Charles E Tabor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Scott
Represented By: Jennifer P McKay
Represented By: Mary E Winchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caddo Parish
Represented By: Charles C Grubb
Represented By: Donna Y Frazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Top Dollar Pawn Gun & Car Audio #5 L L C
Represented By: Kurt A Offner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?