Lee v. Dillon et al

Plaintiff: Machelle A Lee
Defendant: Faithful Gould Inc
Case Number: 5:2012cv01413
Filed: May 29, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: DeSoto
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 56 Motion for Peremptory Exception of No Right of Action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/25/2014. (crt,Dauterive, C)
August 20, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file, by September 9, 2013, a motion for leave to amend her complaint to allege the state in which she is domiciled and, thus a citizen, and allege the states of incorporation and principal place of busin ess for State Farm and GEICO. Counsel for those defendants are directed to promptly provide this information to counsel for Plaintiff so that jurisdiction may be ascertained. (Compliance Deadline set for 9/9/2013.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/20/2013. (crt,Dauterive, C)
August 8, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING denying 10 Motion to Remand and request for fees. A scheduling conference will be set shortly to discuss a trial date and further scheduling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/8/2012. (crt,Keifer, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Dillon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Machelle A Lee
Represented By: Charles W Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faithful Gould Inc
Represented By: Adam Hayes Gates
Represented By: Brian Allen Homza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?