Smith et al v. Shreveport Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Janice Smith and Brent Smith
Defendant: Willie Shaw, J Germain, S Protho, X Y Z Officers, R Brice and Police Dept of Shreveport
Case Number: 5:2012cv01841
Filed: July 5, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Presiding Judge: Tom Stagg
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 59 Second MOTION to Alter Judgment and for Relief From Judgment filed by Brent Smith, Janice Smith. For the reasons discussed herein, the plaintiffs' motion to alter or amend the judgment (Record Document 59) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 8/26/14. (crt,Kennedy, T)
July 14, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 55 MOTION to Alter Judgment and Motion for Relief filed by Brent Smith, Janice Smith. For the reasons discussed herein, the plaintiffs' motion to alter or amend the judgment (Record Document 55) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 7/11/14. (crt,Kennedy, T)
June 5, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by R Brice, J Germain, S Protho, Police Dept of Shreveport, City of Shreveport, Willie Shaw. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 06/05/2014. (crt,McDonnell, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Shreveport Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Germain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Protho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Brice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Dept of Shreveport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Smith
Represented By: Reshonda Leshay Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Smith
Represented By: Reshonda Leshay Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?