Southwestern Electric Power Co et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London et al

Plaintiff: Southwestern Electric Power Co, American Electric Power Service Corp and American Electric Power Co Inc
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Great Lakes Reinsurance (U K) P L C, Princeton Excess & Surplus Lines Insurance Co, Associated Electric & Gas Insurance Services Ltd, Ace American Insurance Co, Infrassure Ltd, Arch Insurance Co Europe Ltd and A B C Insurance Co
Case Number: 5:2012cv02065
Filed: July 31, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: Donald E Walter
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Motion for clarification that the September 26, 2013 ruling is a separate final judgment. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 1/10/14. (crt,Kennedy, T)
September 26, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 57 Report and Recommendations, Amended Complaint, filed by American Electric Power Service Corp, Southwestern Electric Power Co, American Electric Power Co Inc, 1 Notice of Removal, filed by Arch Insurance Co Europe Ltd , Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Great Lakes Reinsurance (U K) P L C, Associated Electric & Gas Insurance Services Ltd ; IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings 16 is granted and the parties are ord ered to resolve the claim presented in an arbitration conducted in accordance with the terms of their insurance policy. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this civil action is stayed and that the Clerk of Court close the case for administrative purposes, given the unlikelihood that further proceedings in this action will be necessary. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 9/25/2013. (crt,Joffrion, B)
November 19, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 13 MOTION to Remand filed by American Electric Power Service Corp, Southwestern Electric Power Co, American Electric Power Co Inc. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 11/19/2012. (crt,McDonnell, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southwestern Electric Power Co et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwestern Electric Power Co
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick McCartney
Represented By: Bobby S Gilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Electric Power Service Corp
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick McCartney
Represented By: Bobby S Gilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Electric Power Co Inc
Represented By: Jonathan Patrick McCartney
Represented By: Bobby S Gilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London
Represented By: Mark R Pickering
Represented By: W Michael Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Reinsurance (U K) P L C
Represented By: W Michael Adams
Represented By: Mark R Pickering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princeton Excess & Surplus Lines Insurance Co
Represented By: W Michael Adams
Represented By: Mark R Pickering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Electric & Gas Insurance Services Ltd
Represented By: W Michael Adams
Represented By: Mark R Pickering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Co
Represented By: W Michael Adams
Represented By: Mark R Pickering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infrassure Ltd
Represented By: W Michael Adams
Represented By: Mark R Pickering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Co Europe Ltd
Represented By: W Michael Adams
Represented By: Mark R Pickering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?