Johnson v. Winn Correctional Center

Plaintiff: Jerrod D Johnson
Defendant: Warden Winn Correctional Center
Case Number: 5:2012cv02134
Filed: August 9, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Winn
Presiding Judge: Donald E Walter
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jerrod D Johnson, 32 Report and Recommendations, 23 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that petitioner's writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as time barred by the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 2244(d). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2253 (c), a Certificate of Appealability is DENIED. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 3/10/2014. (crt,Joffrion, B)
January 11, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY DENIED re 10 Notice of Appeal, 15 Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 01/11/13. (crt,Lundy, N)
October 22, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 4 Report and Recommendations, 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jerrod D Johnson, IT IS ORDERED that petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus corpus be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as time-barred. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 10/22/2012. (crt,Joffrion, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Winn Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Winn Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerrod D Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?