Shelter Products Inc v. American Construction Hotel Corp et al

Plaintiff: Shelter Products Inc
Defendant: American Construction Hotel Corp, Cratus Development L L C and Ganga L L C
Case Number: 5:2012cv02533
Filed: September 20, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Bossier
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING denying 51 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/8/2015. (crt,Dauterive, C)
June 26, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 31 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Shelter's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. 31 ) is granted by holding that ACHC is bound as a surety under the joint check agreement up to the amount of $92,291. The Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 28 ) filed by ACHC and Ganga is granted in part by dismissing the claim against ACHC under the LUTPA and is denied in all other respects. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/26/2014. (crt,Dauterive, C)
February 1, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by Shelter Products Inc: Shelter will be allowed until February 28, 2013 to file a Motion for Leave to Amend its complaint and set forth the necessary information to establish diversity jurisdiction. (Compliance Deadline set for 2/28/2013). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/1/2013. (crt,Dauterive, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shelter Products Inc v. American Construction Hotel Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Construction Hotel Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cratus Development L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ganga L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelter Products Inc
Represented By: Michael Christopher Drew
Represented By: Graham Harris Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?