Wenk v. Bossier et al

Plaintiff: Jason Wenk
Defendant: Royce Coggins, Dept of Public Safety & Corrections, State of Louisiana, Lori Culpepper, Julian Whittington, Rod Boyer, Parish of Bossier, Mark Causey, Steve Hoyle Intensive Substance Abuse Treatment Program and Susan Tucker
Case Number: 5:2012cv02847
Filed: November 6, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Bossier
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 67 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that Motions to Dismiss 43 , 45 , and 64 are granted and all of Plaintiff's remaining claims are dismiss with prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge Tom Stagg on 8/1/2014. (crt,Joffrion, B)
August 29, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 24 Report and Recommendations, dismissing the Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's civil rights claims regarding the administrative remedy procedure, threats, and property be dismissed with prejudice as frivolous under 28 USC Sec 1915(e). Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 08/28/2013. (crt,McDonnell, D)
August 27, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. IT IS ORDERED that the Application for Preliminary Injunction (doc 7 ) be and is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 8/27/2013. (crt,Gregory, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wenk v. Bossier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royce Coggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept of Public Safety & Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian Whittington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rod Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parish of Bossier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Causey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Hoyle Intensive Substance Abuse Treatment Program
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Wenk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?