Chesapeake Louisiana L P et al v. Innovative Wellsite Systems Inc et al

Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, Navigators Insurance Co, Houston Casualty Co, Chesapeake Louisiana L P, Chesapeake Operating Inc, Larchmont Resources L L C, Ivory Working Interest L P, Comstock Oil & Gas L P, Petrohawk Properties L P, Gotham Insurance Co and P X P Louisiana L L C
Defendant: Innovative Wellsite Systems Inc, Petroleum Products & Services Inc, Jingsu Jinshi Machinery Group Co Ltd, Jiangsu Jinshi Machinery Co Ltd and China Petroleum Technology & Development Co
Intervenor_defendant: Innovative Wellsite Systems Inc
Intervenor_plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Co
Case Number: 5:2012cv02963
Filed: November 21, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: DeSoto
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2015 226 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 161 Motion in Limine; denying 162 Motion in Limine; granting 183 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 01/23/2015. (crt,McDonnell, D)
November 6, 2014 222 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 198 Motion to Strike ; denying 205 Motion for Advisory Jury Pursuant to Rule 39(c). The 198 Motion to Strike Jury is granted as to foreign state defendant CPTDC and denied as to non-foreign state defendants WDI and JMP. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 11/06/2014. (crt,McDonnell, D)
September 5, 2014 153 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 113 MOTION in Limine filed by Petroleum Products & Services Inc. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 09/05/2014. (crt,McDonnell, D)
September 4, 2014 152 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING AFFIRMING 92 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct filed by Ivory Working Interest L P, Chesapeake Operating Inc, Navigators Insurance Co, Larchmont Resources L L C, Gotham Insurance Co, P X P Louisiana L L C, Houston Ca sualty Co, Petrohawk Properties L P, Comstock Oil & Gas Louisiana L L C, Chesapeake Louisiana L P, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, DENYING 93 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 09/04/2014. (crt,McDonnell, D)
February 19, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion to Compel; denying 64 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/19/2014. (crt,Dauterive, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chesapeake Louisiana L P et al v. Innovative Wellsite Systems Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London
Represented By: Tyler L Weidlich
Represented By: Joseph B Stamey
Represented By: Kenneth M Klemm
Represented By: Laurie D Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Navigators Insurance Co
Represented By: Tyler L Weidlich
Represented By: Joseph B Stamey
Represented By: Kenneth M Klemm
Represented By: Laurie D Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houston Casualty Co
Represented By: Tyler L Weidlich
Represented By: Joseph B Stamey
Represented By: Kenneth M Klemm
Represented By: Laurie D Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chesapeake Louisiana L P
Represented By: Tyler L Weidlich
Represented By: Joseph B Stamey
Represented By: Kenneth M Klemm
Represented By: Laurie D Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chesapeake Operating Inc
Represented By: Tyler L Weidlich
Represented By: Joseph B Stamey
Represented By: Kenneth M Klemm
Represented By: Laurie D Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larchmont Resources L L C
Represented By: Tyler L Weidlich
Represented By: Joseph B Stamey
Represented By: Kenneth M Klemm
Represented By: Laurie D Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivory Working Interest L P
Represented By: Tyler L Weidlich
Represented By: Joseph B Stamey
Represented By: Kenneth M Klemm
Represented By: Laurie D Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comstock Oil & Gas L P
Represented By: Tyler L Weidlich
Represented By: Joseph B Stamey
Represented By: Kenneth M Klemm
Represented By: Laurie D Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petrohawk Properties L P
Represented By: Tyler L Weidlich
Represented By: Joseph B Stamey
Represented By: Kenneth M Klemm
Represented By: Laurie D Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gotham Insurance Co
Represented By: Laurie D Clark
Represented By: Kenneth M Klemm
Represented By: Joseph B Stamey
Represented By: Tyler L Weidlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P X P Louisiana L L C
Represented By: Tyler L Weidlich
Represented By: Joseph B Stamey
Represented By: Kenneth M Klemm
Represented By: Laurie D Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Wellsite Systems Inc
Represented By: Patrick R Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petroleum Products & Services Inc
Represented By: Raymond C Jackson, III
Represented By: Randall K Theunissen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jingsu Jinshi Machinery Group Co Ltd
Represented By: Addie Danos Arvidson
Represented By: Gerald F Slattery, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jiangsu Jinshi Machinery Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Petroleum Technology & Development Co
Represented By: Addie Danos Arvidson
Represented By: Gerald F Slattery, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Innovative Wellsite Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Co
Represented By: Jake Philip Skaggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?