G & H Development L L C v. Penwell et al

Plaintiff: G & H Development L L C
Defendant: Nancy B Penwell, Doyle Adams, Jim Morris, Fred A Rankin, Benton-Parish Metropolitan Planning Commission, Benton-Parish Metropolitan Board of Appeals, Police Jury Bossier Parish and Bossier Parish
Case Number: 5:2013cv00272
Filed: February 4, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Bossier
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2016 193 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 160 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 162 Motion for Attorney Fees. Penwell is awarded attorney's fees in the amount of $28,054.25 and Adams, Morris, and Rankin are awarded attorney's fees in the amount of $127,527.45. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 09/27/2016. (crt,McDonnell, D)
May 27, 2015 158 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 89 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or in the alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Subdivision Applications filed by Doyle Adams, Fred A Rankin, Jim Morris, Benton-Parish Metropolitan Board of Adjustment, Benton-Parish Metropolitan Board of Appeals, 92 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or in the alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment regarding all Plaintiff's Claims related to the Denial of P laintiff's Subdivision Plat Applications filed by Police Jury Bossier Parish, Parish of Bossier, 88 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or in the alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Subdivisi on Applications filed by Benton-Parish Metropolitan Planning Commission, 90 MOTION for Summary Judgment Addressing Claim IV filed by Police Jury Bossier Parish, Parish of Bossier, Benton-Parish Metropolitan Planning Commission. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 05/27/2015. (crt,McDonnell, D)
May 21, 2015 155 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 87 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or in the alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Benton-Parish Metropolitan Planning Commission, 91 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or in the a lternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment regarding All Plaintiff's Claims Related to the Denial of Plaintiff's Rezoning Application filed by Police Jury Bossier Parish, Parish of Bossier, 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment A ddressing Claim III filed by Police Jury Bossier Parish, Parish of Bossier, Benton-Parish Metropolitan Planning Commission. For the reasons set forth below, all of the defense motions (Record Documents 86, 87 & 91) are GRANTED. G&Hs Claim for Relief III for declaratory judgment and all of its substantive due process claims relating to the Rezoning Application are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 5/21/15. (crt,Kennedy, T)
March 27, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Based on Ripeness filed by Doyle Adams, Police Jury Bossier Parish, Benton-Parish Metropolitan Board of Adjustment, Benton-Parish Metropolitan Board of Appeals, Nancy B Penwell, Bossier Parish, Fred A Rankin, Jim Morris, Benton-Parish Metropolitan Planning Commission. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 03/27/2014. (crt,McDonnell, D)
March 26, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 39 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Claims for Equal Protection and Due Process filed by Doyle Adams, Police Jury Bossier Parish, Benton-Parish Metropolitan Board of Adjustment, Benton-Parish Metropolitan Board of Appeals, Nancy B Penwell, Bossier Parish, Fred A Rankin, Jim Morris, Benton-Parish Metropolitan Planning Commission. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 03/26/20214. (crt,McDonnell, D)
March 25, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 37 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim QUALIFIED IMMUNITY filed by Nancy B Penwell. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 03/25/2014. (crt,McDonnell, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G & H Development L L C v. Penwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G & H Development L L C
Represented By: Lee H Ayres
Represented By: Curtis R Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy B Penwell
Represented By: Neil T Erwin
Represented By: Susannah Orman Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doyle Adams
Represented By: Neil T Erwin
Represented By: Susannah Orman Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Morris
Represented By: Neil T Erwin
Represented By: Susannah Orman Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred A Rankin
Represented By: Neil T Erwin
Represented By: Susannah Orman Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benton-Parish Metropolitan Planning Commission
Represented By: Neil T Erwin
Represented By: Susannah Orman Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benton-Parish Metropolitan Board of Appeals
Represented By: Neil T Erwin
Represented By: Susannah Orman Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Jury Bossier Parish
Represented By: Patrick R Jackson
Represented By: Robert Kennedy, Jr
Represented By: Kenneth Mascagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bossier Parish
Represented By: Patrick R Jackson
Represented By: Robert Kennedy, Jr
Represented By: Kenneth Mascagni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?