Stewart et al v. Capital Safety U S A

Plaintiff: Billy Stewart and Sharon Gilbert
Defendant: D B Industries Inc
Intervenor_plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Co
Intervenor_defendant: Capital Safety U S A, Sharon Gilbert, Billy Stewart and D B Industries Inc
Case Number: 5:2013cv00904
Filed: May 1, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Acadia
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Presiding Judge: Tom Stagg
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 62 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Capital Safety U S A. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 08/19/2016. (crt,McDonnell, D)
March 18, 2016 82 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 63 Daubert Motion Regarding the Testimony of Capital Safety's Expert Gregg S Perkins P.E. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 3/18/2016. (crt,Keifer, K)
February 21, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Before the Court is a Motion for Intra-District Transfer. This matter occured in Caddo Parish, Louisiana; suit was filed in the Lafayette Division. For the following reasons with in this ruling the 12 Motion for Intra-District Transfer is GRANTED. Taking the Gilbert factors as a whole and giving them the weight they deserve, it is clear to this Court that the defendant has carried the burden of proving Shreveport as a clearly more convenient venue for this case. The 12 Motion for Intra-District Transfer is GRANTED and this matter is hereby TRANSFERRED TO THE SHREVEPORT DIVISION. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 2/21/2014. (crt,Putch, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart et al v. Capital Safety U S A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Stewart
Represented By: Lawrence N Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Gilbert
Represented By: Lawrence N Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D B Industries Inc
Represented By: Alexander John Mijalis
Represented By: James A Mijalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Co
Represented By: Dan M Boudreaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Capital Safety U S A
Represented By: Lindsay G Arthur, Jr
Represented By: James A Mijalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Sharon Gilbert
Represented By: Lawrence N Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Billy Stewart
Represented By: Lawrence N Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: D B Industries Inc
Represented By: James A Mijalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?