Cyriak v. Kidd et al

Plaintiff: Anthony Cyriak
Defendant: Kevin Kidd and Eric Scriber
Case Number: 5:2013cv03130
Filed: November 25, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Claiborne
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2016 60 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 57 Report and Recommendations, dismissing Petitioner's complaint without prejudice for failure to prosecute pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 06/01/2016. (crt,McDonnell, D)
July 9, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses. Plaintiff shall respond fully and completely within fourteen days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED That 44 Motion for Extension of Discovery Deadline is GRANTED. Discovery deadline extended to 9/10/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/10/15. (crt,Crawford, A)
May 12, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defendant file an answer to the complaint and comply with the discovery requirements set forth in 17 Order, dated 4/8/14. FURTHER ORDER denying 37 Motion to subpoena medical records. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 5/12/15. (crt,Crawford, A)
March 19, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 27 Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing with prejudice in their entirety plaintiff's claims against defendant Kevin Kidd. FURTHER ORDERED that 22 Motion for Summary Judgment is otherwise denied. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 03/19/2015. (crt,McDonnell, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cyriak v. Kidd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Cyriak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Kidd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Scriber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?