Dunahoe et al v. Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co et al

Plaintiff: Acey B Dunahoe and Celeste Dunahoe
Defendant: Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co, State Farm Fire & Casualty Co, Onyx Services Inc and Austin P Tate
Case Number: 5:2014cv00085
Filed: January 17, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 60 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' claims against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London's are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 9/9/2016. (crt,Keifer, K)
December 9, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER re 36 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaintfiled by Acey B Dunahoe, Celeste Dunahoe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/09/2015. (crt,Williams, L)
February 4, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER: Progressive will be allowed until February 24, 2014 to file an Amended Notice of Removal and attempt to satisfy its burden of demonstrating a basis for diversity jurisdiction. The court will review the case after the deadline and determine whether Progressive has met its burden or the case must be remanded. Compliance Deadline set for 2/24/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/4/14. (crt,Kennedy, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunahoe et al v. Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acey B Dunahoe
Represented By: Justin Carey Dewett
Represented By: Brandon Trey Morris
Represented By: Gerald Adam Savoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celeste Dunahoe
Represented By: Justin Carey Dewett
Represented By: Brandon Trey Morris
Represented By: Gerald Adam Savoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co
Represented By: Ian A MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onyx Services Inc
Represented By: Ian A MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin P Tate
Represented By: Ian A MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?