Riggio v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc et al

Plaintiff: Amanda Riggio
Defendant: Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C and Anthony James Chester
Case Number: 5:2014cv00442
Filed: February 24, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: Donald E Walter
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 27 Motion for Reconsideration re 24 Memorandum Ruling, 26 Judgment. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 5/11/2016. (crt,Bunting, M)
May 1, 2015 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 21 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C and denying as moot 22 MOTION in Limine filed by Amanda Riggio. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 5/1/2015. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 9, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 7 Motion to Remand. The court finds that Plaintiff has failed to state a claim against Chester and that he was improperly joined to this action. Plaintiff's claims against Chester are hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 07/09/2014. (crt,Yocum, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riggio v. Wal-Mart Stores Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C
Represented By: Paul M Adkins
Represented By: B Slattery Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony James Chester
Represented By: Paul M Adkins
Represented By: B Slattery Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Riggio
Represented By: Charles Raleigh Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?