D L Star L L C v. Royal Seal Construction Inc

Plaintiff: D L Star L L C
Defendant: Royal Seal Construction Inc
Counter_claimant: Royal Seal Construction Inc
Counter_defendant: D L Star L L C
Case Number: 5:2014cv00952
Filed: May 7, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 53 Motion for Summary Judgment. All the claims of LD Star, Inc., and JWM of Louisiana, Inc., in this matter are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 3/31/2016. (crt,Keifer, K)
November 23, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 60 Report and Recommendations: It is ORDERED that the 20 Answer to Counterclaim filed by Anderson Concrete Finishers Inc is stricken and the Clerk of Court is directed to enter a default against Anderson on the counterclaim. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 11/20/2015. (crt,Dauterive, C)
February 2, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 12 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision re 11 Order on Motion to Amend. This Court affirms Magistrate Judge Hornsby's Memorandum Order [Record Document 11], denying the Plaintiff's motion to amend its complaint [Record Document 8]. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 2/2/2015. (crt,Keifer, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D L Star L L C v. Royal Seal Construction Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D L Star L L C
Represented By: Charles E Tabor
Represented By: Geoffrey D Westmoreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Seal Construction Inc
Represented By: William Lake Hearne
Represented By: Robert Kennedy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Royal Seal Construction Inc
Represented By: William Lake Hearne
Represented By: Robert Kennedy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: D L Star L L C
Represented By: Charles E Tabor
Represented By: Geoffrey D Westmoreland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?