Bank of Jackson Hole v. Robinson et al

Plaintiff: Bank of Jackson Hole
Defendant: Lewis S Robinson, III, Linda T Robinson, David Evans Robinson, Joye Dale Qualls, Elisa Robinson McKnight, William Walker Robinson and Stephan Spearing Robinson
Case Number: 5:2014cv01413
Filed: June 17, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Bossier
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2016 97 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 86 Motion for Summary Judgment, 94 Motion for Permission to Add a Trial Witness. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 10/31/2016. (crt,McDonnell, D)
March 14, 2016 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 54 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses re 50 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Bank of Jackson Hole. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 3/14/2016. (crt,Keifer, K)
March 16, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 20 MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT MOTION to Enjoin and Dissolve Writ of Seizure and Sale (in the alternative) filed by Lewis S Robinson, III, William Walker Robinson, Linda T Robinson, Stephan Spearing Robinson, Joye D ale Qualls, David Evans Robinson, Elisa Robinson McKnight, 9 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge styled/filed as Objection to Order issuing Writ of Seizure & Sale, and Motion to Stay Without Hearing filed by Lewis S Robinson, III , William Walker Robinson, Linda T Robinson, Stephan Spearing Robinson, Joye Dale Qualls, David Evans Robinson, Elisa Robinson McKnight, 8 MOTION to Enjoin Enforcement for Writ of Seizure & Sale,MOTION to Dissolve Writ, andMOTION to Stay Without Hearing filed by Lewis S Robinson, III, William Walker Robinson, Linda T Robinson, Stephan Spearing Robinson, Joye Dale Qualls, David Evans Robinson, Elisa Robinson McKnight, 36 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge re 34 Orde r on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Vacate filed by Lewis S Robinson, III, William Walker Robinson, Linda T Robinson, Stephan Spearing Robinson, Joye Dale Qualls, David Evans Robinson, Elisa Robinson McKnight. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 03/16/2015. (crt,McDonnell, D)
December 10, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Amend Complaint; granting 23 Motion to Vacate 7 Writ Issued. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/10/14. (crt,Crawford, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of Jackson Hole v. Robinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of Jackson Hole
Represented By: Curtis R Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis S Robinson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda T Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Evans Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joye Dale Qualls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elisa Robinson McKnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Walker Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephan Spearing Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?