Omran v. Prator et al
Plaintiff: Mohamed Ahmed Hassan Abdallah Omran
Defendant: Steve Prator, Robert Wyche, Hicks and Whittiker
Case Number: 5:2014cv02426
Filed: August 4, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Presiding Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER: The Court's previous Memorandum Order (Record Document 106 ) is hereby VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Omran's Motion for Relief from Court Judgment (Record Document 105 ) be and is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 1/18/2017. (crt,HaikSld, K)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 105 Motion for Relief from Court Judgment. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 1/17/2017. (crt,Keifer, K)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 JUDGMENT ADOPTING 75 Report and Recommendations; denying 46 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 48 Motion for Summary Judgment. All claims against all Defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 01/06/2016. (crt,McDonnell, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Omran v. Prator et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Ahmed Hassan Abdallah Omran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Prator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wyche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittiker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?