Wymore v. Nail et al

Plaintiff: Robert L Wymore
Defendant: Lonnie Nail, Jerry Goodwin and Unknown
Case Number: 5:2014cv03493
Filed: December 18, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Claiborne
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 53 Report and Recommendations; denying 39 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 47 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 3/6/2017. (crt,Keifer, K)
January 4, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court WITHDRAWN ORDER denying 39 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 47 Motion for Summary Judgment; and declining to adopt 53 Report and Recommendations. Defendants may reurge their motion for summary judgment by 2/4/2017 if it is substantially similar to the motion now denied by the Court. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 1/4/2017. (crt,Keifer, K) Modified on 1/5/2017 to indicate order withdrawn per 55 (Keifer, K).
April 13, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 23 Motion to Compel, filed by Plaintiff; granting 26 Motion to Compel, filed by Defendants; denying 26 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 28 Motion for Investigation by DOJ and/or FBI, filed by Plaintiff. IT IS ORDERED that, within 14 days, Defendant and Plaintiff supplement their responses to one anothers requested discovery in accordance with the Order herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 4/13/16. (crt,Crawford, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wymore v. Nail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L Wymore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonnie Nail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?