Paquin v. Insurance Co of the State of Pennsylvania

Plaintiff: John Paquin
Defendant: Insurance Co of State of Pennsylvania
Case Number: 5:2015cv00081
Filed: January 14, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: Donald E Walter
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2017 123 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 115 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Josh Kuphal, Hypower Inc. IT IS ORDERED that Hypower and Kuphal's Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. 115], is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 4/24/2017. (crt,Crick, S)
April 26, 2016 82 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING denying Kuphal's Special Appearance and 76 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 76 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the prior service on Kuphal is QUASHED. Far West has 30 days from the date of this order to re-attempt service on Kuphal. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 04/25/2016. (crt,YocumSld, M)
April 1, 2016 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; 61 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Hypower and ICSP's indemnity claims against Far West be and are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 4/1/2016. (crt,Keifer, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paquin v. Insurance Co of the State of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Co of State of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Paquin
Represented By: Douglas M Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?