Ford v. Caddo Parish et al
Plaintiff: Glenn Ford
Defendant: District Attorney Caddo Parish, Paul Carmouche, Charles R Scott, A Marty Stroud, Carey T Schimpf, George McCormick, II, City of Shreveport, Don Ashley, Gary Alderman, Pittman, Rushing, Police Does 1-10 and A B C Insurance Companies
Case Number: 5:2015cv00544
Filed: March 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MEMORANDUM ORDER that the 194 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and 196 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff is to file a Rule 7(a) by 5/15/2020; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the stay previously entered shall be continued without date; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's claims against Defendants Police Does 1-10 and A B C Insurance Companies are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 4/2/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MEMORANDUM RULING re 121 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b) filed by George McCormick Estate. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 12/28/2017. (crt,McDonnell, D)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MEMORANDUM RULING: The Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) 105 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. All of Armstrong's Monell claims against Stewart and Carmouche in their official capacity are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Such dismissal is inclusive of Armstrong's federal malicious prosecution and civil conspiracy claims as well. An order consistent with the terms of the instant Memorandum Ruling shall issue herewith. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 12/6/2017. (crt,Putch, A)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting 136 and 137 Motions to Stay Discovery pending ruling on pending motions to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 5/3/16. (crt,Crawford, A)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re: plaintiff's records from Angola State Pentitentiary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 4/13/15. (crt,Crawford, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Caddo Parish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Ford
Represented By: Mummi Suleiman Ibrahim
Represented By: William Brock Most
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Attorney Caddo Parish
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Carmouche
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles R Scott
Represented By: Tommy J Johnson
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Represented By: Suzanne M Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Marty Stroud
Represented By: Nichole Marie Buckle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carey T Schimpf
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George McCormick, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Shreveport
Represented By: Edwin H Byrd, III
Represented By: Joseph S Woodley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Alderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?