Zyzek et al v. American Security Insurance Co

Plaintiff: Nancy Zyzek, Kenneth Vierdag, Natalie Vierdag, Dalton Vierdag, Brock Vierdag and Ryker Vierdag
Defendant: American Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2015cv01891
Filed: June 17, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 8 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 8/29/2016. (crt,Keifer, K)
December 29, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 23 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiffs shall forward $1,305 to American Security's counsel of record within 30 days and file proof of payment in the record within 7 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/29/15. (crt,Crawford, A)
December 2, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 17 Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs shall provide defendant with their supplemental Rule 26(a) initial disclosures, within the next 14 days. ORDER granting 19 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff shall provide full and complete responses to defendant's Rule 33 Interrogatories and Rule 34 Requests for Production of Documents,propounded on September 15, 2015, within the next 14 days. ORDER granting 17 and 19 Motions for Attorney Fees. Defendant shall file a Motion for Attorney's Fees containing documentation required by Local Rule 54.2, by 12/16/15. Response to motion due by 12/23/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 12/2/15. (crt,Crawford, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zyzek et al v. American Security Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Gordon P Serou, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Zyzek
Represented By: Jesse B Hearin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Vierdag
Represented By: Jesse B Hearin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Vierdag
Represented By: Jesse B Hearin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dalton Vierdag
Represented By: Jesse B Hearin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brock Vierdag
Represented By: Jesse B Hearin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryker Vierdag
Represented By: Jesse B Hearin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?