Jones v. Supreme Court et al

Plaintiff: Hersy Jones, Jr
Defendant: LA State Supreme Court, LA Attorney Disciplinary Board, Robert S Kennedy and Charles B Plattsmier
Case Number: 5:2015cv02766
Filed: December 1, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Caddo
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 59 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint with consent sought but not yet obtained filed by Hersy Jones, Jr, 57 MOTION for Reconsideration re 55 Memorandum Ruling,, 56 Judgment, filed by Hersy Jones, Jr. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 8/28/2017. (crt,McDonnell, D)
March 29, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Robert S Kennedy, Charles B Plattsmier, 12 MOTION to Dismiss The Louisiana Disciplinary Board filed by LA Attorney Disciplinary Board, 33 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LA State Supreme Court, 17 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Hersy Jones, Jr, 34 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by LA State Supreme Court, 44 MOTION for Reconsideration re 43 Order on Motion for Leave to File filed by Hersy Jones, Jr. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 3/29/2017. (crt,McDonnell, D)
August 19, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 24 MOTION for Recusal filed by Hersy Jones, Jr. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks on 08/19/2016. (crt,McDonnell, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Supreme Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hersy Jones, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA State Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA Attorney Disciplinary Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles B Plattsmier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?