J & L Family L L C v. B H P Billiton Petroleum Properties (N A) L P et al

Plaintiff: J & L Family L L C
Defendant: B H P Billiton Petroleum Properties (N A) L P, Petrohawk Energy Corp, B H P Billiton Petroleum (K C S Resources) L L C and B H P Billiton Petroleum (TxLa Operating) Co
Case Number: 5:2016cv01193
Filed: August 17, 2016
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Bossier
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2018 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 84 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 87 Sealed Motion to Limit Discovery, Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/2/2018. (crt,Dauterive, C)
March 23, 2018 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 77 Motion to Dismiss. Longleaf's fraud and LUTPA claims are dismissed without prejudice, and Longleaf is granted until 4/23/2018 to file an amended complaint that pleads these allegations with the specificity required by Rule 9(b). Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 3/23/2018. (crt,Keifer, K)
February 6, 2018 81 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 48 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 2/6/2018. (crt,Dauterive, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & L Family L L C v. B H P Billiton Petroleum Properties (N A) L P et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & L Family L L C
Represented By: Randall Stephen Davidson
Represented By: William Lake Hearne, Jr
Represented By: Andrew David Martin
Represented By: James Davis Powell
Represented By: Grant E Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B H P Billiton Petroleum Properties (N A) L P
Represented By: Brittan Jackson Bush
Represented By: Michael Herold Ishee
Represented By: April Leigh Rolen-Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petrohawk Energy Corp
Represented By: Brittan Jackson Bush
Represented By: Michael Herold Ishee
Represented By: April Leigh Rolen-Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B H P Billiton Petroleum (K C S Resources) L L C
Represented By: Brittan Jackson Bush
Represented By: Michael Herold Ishee
Represented By: April Leigh Rolen-Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B H P Billiton Petroleum (TxLa Operating) Co
Represented By: Brittan Jackson Bush
Represented By: Michael Herold Ishee
Represented By: April Leigh Rolen-Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?