Garrett v. USA et al
Plaintiff: Kenyon J Garrett
Defendant: USA, Dept of Veterans Affairs, Overton Brooks V A Medical Center, Kenneth Booth, Toby Mathew, Larry G Thirstrup, Robert Lukeman, Agmasie B Woldie, Furqan Muhammad, Known & unknown Medical Staff and Arvind Yekanath
Case Number: 5:2017cv00784
Filed: June 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Shreveport Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Karen L Hayes
Presiding Judge: Robert G James
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 129 RULING denying 127 Motion to Amend Judgment: FRCP 59 and FRCP 60. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/21/2019. (crt,Jones, P)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MEMORANDUM RULING re 77 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kenyon J Garrett, 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by USA and 86 MOTION to Strike Exhibits 17-B, 57, 58, 78-B, 80, 80-A, 80-B, and 80-C filed by USA. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 2/19/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMORANDUM RULING re 79 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Kenyon J Garrett and 83 Amended MOTION for Sanctions and MOTION in Limine filed by Kenyon J Garrettt. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 2/12/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 JUDGMENT ADOPTING 50 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, granting in part and denying in part 7 Partial Motion to Dismiss. To the extent that the USA moves for dismissal of Plaintiff's claim for false imprisonment, the motion is granted, and this claim is Dismissed Without Prejudice. The motion is otherwise Denied. It Is Further Ordered that 26 Motion to Dismiss for Perjury is Denied. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 1/9/2018. (crt,Crawford, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenyon J Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Overton Brooks V A Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toby Mathew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry G Thirstrup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lukeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agmasie B Woldie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furqan Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Known & unknown Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvind Yekanath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?