Sanders et al v. Nexion Health at Minden Inc
Plaintiff: Barbara F Sanders, Melissa Davis, Glenn A Ford, George Ford, Jr, Martin Ford and Lela Mae Ford
Defendant: Nexion Health at Minden Inc, T I G Insurance Co and RiverStone Group L L C
Case Number: 5:2018cv00263
Filed: March 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Shreveport Office
County: Webster
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Presiding Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM RULING denying 18 MOTION to Dismiss; and granting in part and denying in part 23 MOTION to Strike. The parties are referred to the Magistrate Judge for entry of a scheduling order. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 9/6/2018. (crt,Keifer, K)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM ORDER: If Plaintiffs contest the assertion that RiverStone was improperly joined, they must file a motion to remand, supported by a memorandum, by April 27, 2018 and explain why there is a reasonable basis to predict that state law woul d allow Plaintiffs to recover against RiverStone. If Plaintiffs timely file a motion to remand, it will be noticed for briefing so that the defendants can respond and attempt to meet their burden on the improper joinder issue. If Plaintiffs do not timely file a motion to remand and challenge the improper joinder plea, the court will consider Plaintiffs to concede the point, RiverStone will be dismissed, and the case will proceed toward a Scheduling Order (Compliance Deadline set for 4/27/2018.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/26/2018. (crt,Dauterive, C)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER re 1 Notice of Removal filed by T I G Insurance Co, RiverStone Group L L C. Defendants removed the case based on an assertion of diversity jurisdiction, which puts the burden on them to set forth facts that show that there is complete diversity of citizenship. The notice of removal does not meet that burden. To avoid any doubt about subject-matter jurisdiction, the removing defendants should include in their amended notice of removal specific allegations with respect t o the form of entity of RiverStone. If they continue to contend that it is a corporation, they should explain the inclusion of LLC in its name and cite legal authority for including those letters in the name of a corporation formed under Delaware law . If RiverStone is actually a limited liability company, the amended notice of removal will need to set forth its members and their citizenship in accordance with the rules set forth above. The deadline for filing the amended notice of removal is March 23, 2018. Compliance Deadline set for 3/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/6/2018. (crt,Keller, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders et al v. Nexion Health at Minden Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara F Sanders
Represented By: Loreta L Middleton
Represented By: Todd A Townsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Davis
Represented By: Loreta L Middleton
Represented By: Todd A Townsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn A Ford
Represented By: Loreta L Middleton
Represented By: Todd A Townsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Ford, Jr
Represented By: Loreta L Middleton
Represented By: Todd A Townsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Ford
Represented By: Loreta L Middleton
Represented By: Todd A Townsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lela Mae Ford
Represented By: Loreta L Middleton
Represented By: Todd A Townsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nexion Health at Minden Inc
Represented By: Fred Sherman Boughton, Jr
Represented By: Christy L McMannen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T I G Insurance Co
Represented By: Jay M Lonero
Represented By: Thomas H Peyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RiverStone Group L L C
Represented By: Jay M Lonero
Represented By: Thomas H Peyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?