Hewitt et al v. 3 G Energy Services L L C et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Hewitt and Rachel Fodale
Defendant: Owner Taso Sofitkitis, Trust RSC FAMILY TRUST, Corp 3G Energy Services LLC, Richard S Crawford, Anastasios Sofitkitis Irrevocable Living Trust, Jeremy Woodle, Corp UBS LLC a/k/a Ultrablend Solutions LLC, Taso Sofitkitis, 3 G Energy Services L L C, R S C Family Trust and U B S L L C
Case Number: 5:2018cv00955
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Shreveport Office
County: DeSoto
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rachel Fodale, Sharon Hewitt. Richard S Crawford waiver sent on 7/24/2018, answer due 9/24/2018. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture correct filing event and indicate correct waiver sent and answer due dates. See document 6 to view PDF image. (crt,ThomasSld, T) Modified to add document number on 8/20/2018 (ThomasSld, T).
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rachel Fodale, Sharon Hewitt. Richard S Crawford waiver sent on 7/24/2018, answer due 9/24/2018. (aty,Thompson, Robert) Modified to edit docket text and to reflect correct service date and answer due date as an incorrect service date was entered at the time of e-filing on 8/20/2018 (ThomasSld, T).
August 9, 2018 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Robert I Thompson, III on behalf of Rachel Fodale, Sharon Hewitt regarding #4 Waiver of Service Executed, #5 Waiver of Service Executed. Action taken: docket text modified to reflect correct service date 7/24/2018 and answer due date 9/24/2018 as an incorrect service date was entered at the time of e-filing. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rachel Fodale, Sharon Hewitt. Taso Sofitkitis waiver sent on 7/24/2018, answer due 9/24/2018; U B S L L C waiver sent on 7/24/2018, answer due 9/24/2018; Jeremy Woodle waiver sent on 7/24/2018, answer due 9/24/2018. (aty,Thompson, Robert) Modified to correct waiver sent and answer due date on 8/9/2018 (ThomasSld, T).
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rachel Fodale, Sharon Hewitt. 3 G Energy Services L L C waiver sent on 7/24/2018, answer due 9/24/2018; Anastasios Sofitkitis Irrevocable Living Trust waiver sent on 7/24/2018, answer due 9/24/2018. (aty,Thompson, Robert) Modified to correct waiver sent and answer due date on 8/9/2018 (ThomasSld, T).
July 24, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 3 G Energy Services L L C, Anastasios Sofitkitis Irrevocable Living Trust, Richard S Crawford, R S C Family Trust, Taso Sofitkitis, U B S L L C, Jeremy Woodle. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 24, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Rachel Fodale, Sharon Hewitt. (aty,Thompson, Robert)
July 20, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3706870) filed by Sharon Hewitt, Rachel Fodale. (Attachments: #1 Cover Page)(Attorney Robert I Thompson, III added to party Sharon Hewitt(pty:pla))(aty,Thompson, Robert) Modified to edit docket text on 7/23/2018 (ThomasSld, T).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hewitt et al v. 3 G Energy Services L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owner Taso Sofitkitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust RSC FAMILY TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corp 3G Energy Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anastasios Sofitkitis Irrevocable Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Woodle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corp UBS LLC a/k/a Ultrablend Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taso Sofitkitis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3 G Energy Services L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R S C Family Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U B S L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Hewitt
Represented By: Robert I Thompson, III
Represented By: Kelly L Long
Represented By: Christopher D Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Fodale
Represented By: Kelly L Long
Represented By: Christopher D Hatch
Represented By: Robert I Thompson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?