Coleman et al v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Co

Plaintiff: Martha Spears and Robbie Coleman
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Co
Case Number: 5:2018cv01224
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
0 Judge: Terry A Doughty
1 Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2018 13 RULE 26(f) Report by Robbie Coleman, Martha Spears, Shelter Mutual Insurance Co. (aty,Jones, Reid) Modified on 11/16/2018 to add filer (FinnSld, P).
October 29, 2018 12 Featured Case CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 1/2/2019. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 10/29/2018. (crt,Crawford, A)
October 29, 2018 11 Featured Case ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY re #10 Order Setting Scheduling Conference: The scheduling conference set for 12/10/2018 is canceled. Judge Doughty will issue a scheduling order in due course. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/29/2018. (crt,Stephens, M)
October 26, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2018 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 11/26/2018. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 12/3/2018. Rule 26 Report due by 12/3/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/26/2018. (crt,Keller, J)
October 25, 2018 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Shelter Mutual Insurance Co.(aty,Wilkes, Gregg)
October 24, 2018 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shelter Mutual Insurance Co. (aty,Wilkes, Gregg)
October 10, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time allowed defendant, SHELTER MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, to file its answer, other responsive pleadings, or otherwise defend this action be and it is extended for a period of fifteen (15) days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/10/2018. (crt,Keller, J)
October 10, 2018 6 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to Gregg A Wilkes on behalf of Shelter Mutual Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/24/2018. (crt,FinnSld, P)
October 9, 2018 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Shelter Mutual Insurance Co. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Gregg A Wilkes added to party Shelter Mutual Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Wilkes, Gregg)
September 19, 2018 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robbie Coleman, Martha Spears. Shelter Mutual Insurance Co served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (aty,Jones, Reid)
September 19, 2018 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L. Hornsby on 9/19/2018. (crt,Stephens, M)
September 18, 2018 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shelter Mutual Insurance Co (crt,FinnSld, P)
September 18, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,FinnSld, P)
September 18, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Shelter Mutual Insurance Co (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3756217) filed by Robbie Coleman, Martha Spears. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Reid Allen Jones added to party Robbie Coleman and Martha Spears(pty:pla))(aty,Jones, Reid)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman et al v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Spears
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbie Coleman
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Co
Represented By: James R Sterritt
Represented By: Jason Blance Nichols
Represented By: Gregg A Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?