Davila et al v. F C A U S L L C et al
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Davila, Jr., Gabriella Davila, Lorenzo Davila, Monica Davila, Daniella Davila, Isabela Davila and Lorenzo Davila, Jr
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Co, John Jaramillo, Russell Thomas, FCA US, LLC, Kevin Badger, Pel-State Oil Company, Inc., M. Todd Huebner, Pel-State Bulk Plant, LLC, McWhorter's Ltd., Pel-State Oil Co Inc, A B C Insurance Co, Martin Todd Huebner, M Todd Huebner, E F G Insurance Co, John Taramillo, McWhorters Ltd, Pel-State Bulk Plant L L C and F C A U S L L C
Case Number: 5:2018cv01487
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Remand to Clerk of 1st Judicial District Court for Caddo Parish. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 12/14/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 14, 2018 Filing 24 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #14 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, sent to Donald J Armand, Jr on behalf of McWhorters Ltd. Show Cause Response due by 12/28/2018. (crt,Mitchell, P)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Roberto Rene Garcia for Daniella Davila, Gabriella Davila, Isabela Davila, Lorenzo Davila, Jr, Lorenzo Davila, and Monica Davila. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/12/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 12, 2018 Motions Transferred regarding #22 Unopposed MOTION to Remand. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 12, 2018 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION to Remand by Pel-State Bulk Plant L L C, Pel-State Oil Co Inc, Zurich American Insurance Co. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Hemken, David)
December 11, 2018 Filing 21 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Certificate of Good Standing filed by Daniella Davila, Gabriella Davila, Isabela Davila, Lorenzo Davila, Jr, Lorenzo Davila, Monica Davila regarding #12 MOTION for Roberto Rene Garcia to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3816114) . (aty,Offner, Kurt)
December 10, 2018 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by F C A U S L L C identifying Corporate Parent Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N V for F C A U S L L C. (aty,McDaniel, Keith)
December 6, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Deficiency to Kurt A Offner on behalf of Daniella Davila, Gabriella Davila, Isabela Davila, Lorenzo Davila, Jr, Lorenzo Davila, Monica Davila regarding #12 MOTION for Roberto Rene Garcia to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3816114). Reason: The above item requires a current certificate of good standing. Please refer to LR83.2.6 for more specific requirements. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 3, 2018 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pel-State Oil Co Inc identifying Corporate Parent PSO, LLC for Pel-State Oil Co Inc. (aty,Hemken, David)
December 3, 2018 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pel-State Bulk Plant L L C identifying Corporate Parent PSO, LLC for Pel-State Bulk Plant L L C. (aty,Hemken, David)
December 3, 2018 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zurich American Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd, Other Affiliate Zurich Insurance Co Ltd, Other Affiliate Zurich Insurance Group Ltd, Other Affiliate Zurich Holding Co of America for Zurich American Insurance Co. (aty,Hemken, David)
December 3, 2018 Filing 15 SECOND NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement, re: #3 Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to David Jonathan Hemken, Sidney Earl Cook, Jr, John Tucker Kalmbach on behalf of Pel-State Bulk Plant L L C, Pel-State Oil Co Inc, Zurich American Insurance Co. Show Cause Response due by 12/17/2018. (crt,Mitchell, P)
November 28, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #13 Answer to Complaint, sent to Donald J Armand, Jr on behalf of McWhorters Ltd. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/12/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 28, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by McWhorters Ltd.(Attorney Donald J Armand, Jr added to party McWhorters Ltd(pty:dft))(aty,Armand, Donald)
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Roberto Rene Garcia to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3816114) by Daniella Davila, Gabriella Davila, Isabela Davila, Lorenzo Davila, Jr, Lorenzo Davila, Monica Davila. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Offner, Kurt)Modified to reflect deficient status on 12/6/2018 (Bunting, M). Modified to remove deficient status on 12/11/2018 (Bunting, M). See Corrective Document #21 .
November 26, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #10 Consent to Removal, sent to Keith W McDaniel on behalf of F C A U S L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 12/10/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by F C A U S L L C (Attorney Keith W McDaniel added to party F C A U S L L C(pty:dft)). (aty,McDaniel, Keith)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Pel-State Bulk Plant L L C, Pel-State Oil Co Inc. (aty,Hemken, David)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Pel-State Bulk Plant L L C, Pel-State Oil Co Inc, Zurich American Insurance Co. (aty,Hemken, David) Modified on 11/21/2018 to edit text (Putch, A).
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ORDER: If plaintiffs contest the assertion that non-diverse defendants were improperly joined, plaintiffs are allowed until 1/9/2019 to file a motion to remand. If plaintiffs wish to assert procedural defects, they must file a motion to remand within statutory window. If plaintiffs do not file a motion, improperly joined defendants will be dismissed, and case will proceed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/20/2018. (crt,Dunford, T)
November 19, 2018 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Pel-State Oil Co Inc answer due 11/21/2018. Administrative entry: The PDF image can be found as attachment #1 to Amended Document #6 . (crt,Dunford, T)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Zurich American Insurance Co. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J Citation/return on Pel-State Oil Co, #2 Exhibit K Pro Hac Vice Motion for Bobby Garcia, #3 Exhibit L Declaration of William H. Broyles III, #4 Exhibit M SOS Pel-State Bulk Plant LLC, #5 Exhibit N SOS Pel-State Oil Company, Inc.)(aty,Hemken, David) Modified attachment names on 11/20/2018 (Dunford, T).
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/16/2018. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to David Jonathan Hemken, Sidney Earl Cook, Jr, John Tucker Kalmbach on behalf of Pel-State Bulk Plant L L C, Pel-State Oil Co Inc, Zurich American Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/29/2018. (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 14, 2018 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 14, 2018 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. F C A U S L L C answer due 11/21/2018. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #7 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Pel-State Bulk Plant, LLC, Pel-State Oil Company, Inc., Zurich American Insurance Co.(Attorney David Jonathan Hemken added to party Pel-State Bulk Plant, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Jonathan Hemken added to party Pel-State Oil Company, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Hemken, David)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 611848 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3805951) filed by Zurich American Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Fax Filed Petition, #3 Exhibit Petition, #4 Exhibit Citation to Zurich, #5 Exhibit Citation to Pel-State Bulk Plant, #6 Exhibit Citation to Pel-State Oil Company, #7 Exhibit Citation to FCA, #8 Exhibit Citation to John Taramillo, #9 Exhibit Citation to Todd Huebner, #10 Exhibit Letter to Court by Todd Huebner)(Attorney David Jonathan Hemken added to party Zurich American Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Hemken, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davila et al v. F C A U S L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Co
Represented By: David Jonathan Hemken
Represented By: Sidney Earl Cook, Jr
Represented By: John Tucker Kalmbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jaramillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Badger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pel-State Oil Company, Inc.
Represented By: David Jonathan Hemken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Todd Huebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pel-State Bulk Plant, LLC
Represented By: David Jonathan Hemken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McWhorter's Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pel-State Oil Co Inc
Represented By: David Jonathan Hemken
Represented By: Sidney Earl Cook, Jr
Represented By: John Tucker Kalmbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Todd Huebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Todd Huebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E F G Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Taramillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McWhorters Ltd
Represented By: Zachary Alexander Wilkes
Represented By: Donald J Armand, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pel-State Bulk Plant L L C
Represented By: David Jonathan Hemken
Represented By: Sidney Earl Cook, Jr
Represented By: John Tucker Kalmbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F C A U S L L C
Represented By: Quincy T Crochet
Represented By: Mary Wilderotter Dale
Represented By: Keith W McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Davila, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriella Davila
Represented By: Jeanne Katherine Demarest
Represented By: Amy Collins Fontenot
Represented By: Kurt A Offner
Represented By: J Bart Kelly, III
Represented By: Roberto Rene Garcia
Represented By: Roderick Alvendia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Davila
Represented By: Jeanne Katherine Demarest
Represented By: Amy Collins Fontenot
Represented By: Kurt A Offner
Represented By: J Bart Kelly, III
Represented By: Roberto Rene Garcia
Represented By: Roderick Alvendia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Davila
Represented By: Jeanne Katherine Demarest
Represented By: Amy Collins Fontenot
Represented By: Kurt A Offner
Represented By: J Bart Kelly, III
Represented By: Roberto Rene Garcia
Represented By: Roderick Alvendia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniella Davila
Represented By: Jeanne Katherine Demarest
Represented By: Amy Collins Fontenot
Represented By: Kurt A Offner
Represented By: J Bart Kelly, III
Represented By: Roberto Rene Garcia
Represented By: Roderick Alvendia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabela Davila
Represented By: Jeanne Katherine Demarest
Represented By: Amy Collins Fontenot
Represented By: Kurt A Offner
Represented By: J Bart Kelly, III
Represented By: Roberto Rene Garcia
Represented By: Roderick Alvendia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Davila, Jr
Represented By: Jeanne Katherine Demarest
Represented By: Amy Collins Fontenot
Represented By: Kurt A Offner
Represented By: J Bart Kelly, III
Represented By: Roberto Rene Garcia
Represented By: Roderick Alvendia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?