Jenkins v. Digco Utility Construction L P et al

Plaintiff: Richard Jenkins
Defendant: Digco Construction, L.P., Centerpoint Energy Resources, Digco Utility Construction L P and Centerpoint Energy Resources Corp
Cross Defendant: A B C Insurance Co
Case Number: 5:2019cv00021
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
0 Judge: S Maurice Hicks
1 Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2019 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 3/20/2019. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 3/27/2019. Rule 26 Report due by 3/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/13/2019. (crt,Keifer, K)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L. Hornsby on 1/22/2019. (crt,Stephens, M)
January 22, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Centerpoint Energy Resources Corp identifying Corporate Parents, Utility Holding L L C, CenterPoint Energy Inc, for Centerpoint Energy Resources Corp. (aty,Williams, Douglas) Modified on 1/22/2019 to add filer and modify docket text. (Crick, S).
January 22, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Digco Utility Construction L P identifying Corporate Parents, Mejia Personnel Services Inc, Quanta Holdings G P 1 L L C, P W R Financial Co, for Digco Utility Construction L P. (aty,Williams, Douglas) Modified on 1/22/2019 to add filer and modify docket text. (Crick, S).
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO #5 REMOVAL ORDER by Centerpoint Energy Resources Corp, Digco Utility Construction L P . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Williams, Douglas) Modified on 1/22/2019 to create docket entry relationship. (Crick, S).
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED #1 Notice of Removal by Centerpoint Energy Resources Corp, Digco Utility Construction L P. (aty,Williams, Douglas) Modified on 01/18/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/11/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Digco must file an amended notice of removal by January 18, 2019 that sets forth the necessary details regarding its citizenship and the citizenship of all of its members. Failure to do so may result in the case being remanded to state court. Compliance Deadline set for 1/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/11/2019. (crt,Keller, J)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Reasor, M)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Douglas Kent Williams on behalf of Centerpoint Energy Resources Corp, Digco Utility Construction L P. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/23/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
January 8, 2019 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Crick, S)
January 8, 2019 ANSWER to Crossclaim by Digco Utility Construction L P filed on 10/29/2018 in Case No 77,147, 26th Judicial District Court, Webster Parish, Louisiana. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as pdf included within attachment of #1 Notice of Removal(crt,Crick, S)
January 8, 2019 ANSWER to #1 Petition for Damages, CROSSCLAIM against Digco Utility Construction L P, A B C Insurance Co by Centerpoint Energy Resources Corp filed on 09/21/2018 in Case No 77,147, 26th Judicial District Court, Webster Parish, Louisiana. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as pdf of Answer, Crossclaim included within attachment to #1 Notice of Removal.(crt,Crick, S)
January 8, 2019 ANSWER to #1 Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by Digco Utility Construction L P filed on 08/02/2018 in Case No 77,147, 26th Judicial District Court, Webster Parish, Louisiana. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as pdf included within attachment to #1 Notice of Removal.(crt,Crick, S)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 26th JDC Webster Parish, Case Number 77147 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3845575) filed by Digco Utility Construction L P, Centerpoint Energy Resources. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit Notice to Adverse Party (Camel), #5 Exhibit Notice to Adverse Party (Lavespere), #6 Exhibit A - state court suit record, #7 Exhibit B, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Exhibit D)(Attorney Douglas Kent Williams added to party Centerpoint Energy Resources(pty:dft), Digco Utility Construction L P(pty:dft))(aty,Williams, Douglas) Modified on 1/9/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. Digco Utility Construction L P et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Jenkins
Represented By: Jerry L Lavespere, Jr
Represented By: Kevin L Camel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digco Construction, L.P.
Represented By: Douglas Kent Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerpoint Energy Resources
Represented By: Douglas Kent Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digco Utility Construction L P
Represented By: Christopher Aaron Mason
Represented By: Christopher D Billings
Represented By: Katherine M Cook
Represented By: Douglas Kent Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerpoint Energy Resources Corp
Represented By: Douglas Kent Williams
Represented By: Christopher Aaron Mason
Represented By: Christopher D Billings
Represented By: Katherine M Cook
Represented By: Lauren Baylor Dietzen
Represented By: Matthew Tumey Habig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: A B C Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?