Mobley et al v. M C S Financial Global Investments L L C et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Mobley and Randi Mobley
Defendant: MCS Financial Global Investments, LLC, Bobby McMillian, Tony Clarkson and M C S Financial Global Investments L L C
Case Number: 5:2019cv00194
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter and Personal Jurisdiction filed by Jeremy Mobley, Randi Mobley. (aty,Jones, Reid)
April 3, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER from Clerk to Mr McMillian regarding #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter and Personal Jurisdiction requesting future filings be directed to clerk.(crt,Dunford, T)
March 28, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Strike #6 Answer to Complaint, filed by Jeremy Mobley, Randi Mobley. (aty,Jones, Reid)
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter and Personal Jurisdiction. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,FinnSld, P)
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter and Personal Jurisdiction entitled "MOTION Not to Strike Letter of Rogatory", AND, MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION to #8 MOTION to Strike by Bobby McMillian. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,FinnSld, P) Modified on 3/28/2019 to edit text, correct event per chambers and add document relation (FinnSld, P).
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion to Strike served on Bobby McMillian on March 18, 2019, filed by Jeremy Mobley, Randi Mobley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-FedEx Tracking Information)(aty,Jones, Reid)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #8 MOTION to Strike #6 Answer to Complaint. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,FinnSld, P)
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Summons Returned Executed filed by Jeremy Mobley, Randi Mobley regarding #7 Affidavit of Service . (aty,Jones, Reid)
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Strike #6 Answer to Complaint, by Jeremy Mobley, Randi Mobley. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Jones, Reid) Modified on 3/15/2019 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Tony Clarkson on March 2, 2019, answer due 3/25/2019, filed by Jeremy Mobley, Randi Mobley. (aty,Jones, Reid) Modified on 3/14/2019 to indicate answer due date (FinnSld, P).
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint entitled "Letter Rogatory for Relief under the Hauge Convention Title 18: 1781" filed by Bobby Rydel El Mcmillian, executor for Bobby Rydell McMillian cestui que trust", by Bobby McMillian. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,FinnSld, P)
February 25, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Reid Allen Jones on behalf of Jeremy Mobley, Randi Mobley regarding #4 Summons Returned Executed, #5 Summons Returned Executed. Action taken: Modified docket entry to correct service date and answer due date. (crt,FinnSld, P)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeremy Mobley, Randi Mobley. M C S Financial Global Investments L L C served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (aty,Jones, Reid) Modified on 2/25/2019 to correct service and answer due date (FinnSld, P).
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeremy Mobley, Randi Mobley. Bobby McMillian served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (aty,Jones, Reid) Modified on 2/25/2019 to correct service and answer due date (FinnSld, P).
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/19/2019. (crt,Stephens, M)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tony Clarkson, M C S Financial Global Investments L L C, Bobby McMillian (crt,FinnSld, P)
February 15, 2019 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,FinnSld, P)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tony Clarkson, M C S Financial Global Investments L L C, Bobby McMillian, with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3878703) filed by Jeremy Mobley, Randi Mobley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Executed Participation Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2-May 2017 Statement, #3 Exhibit 3-June 2018 Statement, #4 Exhibit 4-Screenshot of MCS address, #5 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Reid Allen Jones added to party Jeremy Mobley and Randi Mobley(pty:pla))(aty,Jones, Reid) Modified on 2/19/2019 to edit text (FinnSld, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mobley et al v. M C S Financial Global Investments L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Mobley
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randi Mobley
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCS Financial Global Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby McMillian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Clarkson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M C S Financial Global Investments L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?