Module X Solutions L L C et al v. Webber
Plaintiff: Steven L Schoonover and Module X Solutions L L C
Defendant: Mary LaShonda Webber
Case Number: 5:2019cv00276
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE ENTRY: The Court will consider the #2 MOTION to Dismiss as is with no need for additional or supplemental briefing. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 4/11/2019. (crt,McDonnell, D)
April 2, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Case MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Mary LaShonda Webber. (aty,Kennedy, Robert)
March 28, 2019 Filing 15 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mary LaShonda Webber with Jury Demand filed by Module X Solutions L L C, Steven L Schoonover.(crt,FinnSld, P)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/28/2019. (crt,FinnSld, P)
March 27, 2019 Filing 13 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Unopposed Motion to Amend WITH CONSENT filed by Module X Solutions L L C, Steven L Schoonover regarding #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct with consent . (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,McMichael, James) Modified on 3/27/2019 to edit text and indicate #8 MOTION referred (FinnSld, P).
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Case MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Module X Solutions L L C, Steven L Schoonover. (Attachments: #1 Certified Transcript of Webber Testimony)(aty,McMichael, James) Modified on 3/27/2019 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #2 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Case, MOTION for More Definite Statement. Responses due by 3/26/2019. Replies due by 4/2/2019. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 3/20/2019. (crt,Putch, A)
March 19, 2019 Motions Transferred regarding #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply with consent . Motions referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,FinnSld, P)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Deficiency to James Charles McMichael, Jr on behalf of Module X Solutions L L C, Steven L Schoonover regarding #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct with consent . Reason: You do not indicate whether opposing counsel consent to the granting of this ex parte motion. Please refer to LR7.4.1, 7.6, or 7.9 for specific instructions regarding statements of consent. The motion cannot be referred to chambers until this deficiency is corrected. (crt,FinnSld, P)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply with consent by Module X Solutions L L C, Steven L Schoonover. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,McMichael, James) Modified on 3/19/2019 to edit text (FinnSld, P).
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct with consent by Module X Solutions L L C, Steven L Schoonover. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order)(aty,McMichael, James) Modified on 3/19/2019 to edit text and indicate deficiency (FinnSld, P). Modified on 3/27/2019 to remove deficiency SEE #13 Corrective Document (FinnSld, P).
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Mary LaShonda Webber . (aty,Kennedy, Robert)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Mary LaShonda Webber . (aty,Kennedy, Robert)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/6/2019. (crt,Keller, J)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Motion Setting without oral argument regarding: #2 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Case. Motions referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Thigpen, M)
March 4, 2019 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
March 4, 2019 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mary LaShonda Webber with Jury Demand filed by Module X Solutions L L C, Steven L Schoonover. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #5 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Case, MOTION for More Definite Statement by Mary LaShonda Webber. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Kennedy, Robert). Modified on 3/20/2019 to capture all reliefs requested in pleading; Added MOTION for More Definite Statement (Putch, A).
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal and Related Action from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 614,297 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3890736) filed by Mary LaShonda Webber. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 State court notice of filing, #3 State court notice of filing, #4 State court petition, #5 State court petition, #6 State court citation)(Attorney Robert Kennedy, Jr added to party Mary LaShonda Webber(pty:dft))(aty,Kennedy, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Module X Solutions L L C et al v. Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven L Schoonover
Represented By: James Charles McMichael, Jr
Represented By: Elizabeth Eileen Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Module X Solutions L L C
Represented By: James Charles McMichael, Jr
Represented By: Elizabeth Eileen Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary LaShonda Webber
Represented By: Robert Kennedy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?