Vallo v. Tanner et al

Plaintiff: Joshua Vallo
Defendant: Robert Tanner and LA Attorney General
Case Number: 5:2019cv00468
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO STRIKE for failure to: Submit document on approved form. Pay the filing fee or submit IFP application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/26/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 5/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 2254 form, #2 ifp form)(crt,Haik, K)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/16/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 12, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-09138. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that Vallo's petition for habeascorpus relief pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Louisiana, where petitioner was convicted and sentenced. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 4/12/19.(clc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/12/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254). Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 4/30/2019. (sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/12/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 **DEFICIENT** PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) filed by Joshua Vallo. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibits, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sbs) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 4/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vallo v. Tanner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Vallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?