Elliot v. Napa River Insurance Services et al
Plaintiff: Jason Elliot
Defendant: Napa River Insurance Services, James Grimes, Gulf Winds International, Inc., Shelter Mutual Insurance Co, Gulf Winds International Inc and James K Grimes
Case Number: 5:2019cv00472
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Shelter Mutual Insurance Co.(aty,Wilkes, Gregg)
June 4, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Elliot. Gulf Winds International Inc served on 05/03/19 (aty,Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 6/4/2019 to correctly identify document (Dauterive, C).
June 4, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Elliot. Shelter Mutual Insurance Co served on 4/24/2019. (aty,Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 6/4/2019 to correctly identify document (Dauterive, C).
June 4, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Elliot. Napa River Insurance Services served on 4/24/2019. (aty,Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 6/4/2019 to correctly identify document (Dauterive, C).
May 30, 2019 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Gulf Winds International Inc. (aty,James, David)
May 30, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Napa River Insurance Services identifying Corporate Parent Hudson Insurance Co for Napa River Insurance Services. (aty,James, David) Modified on 5/31/2019 to edit text (Williams, L).
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Annie Jo Jacobs for Gulf Winds International Inc and Napa River Insurance Services. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 5/29/2019. (crt,Miletello, A)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Marianne Laine for Gulf Winds International Inc and Napa River Insurance Services. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 5/29/2019. (crt,Miletello, A)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Annie Jacobs to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3958703) by Gulf Winds International Inc, Napa River Insurance Services. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,James, David)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Marianne Laine to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3958671) by Gulf Winds International Inc, Napa River Insurance Services. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,James, David)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 5/23/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #7 Answer to Complaint, #8 Answer to Complaint, sent to David Earl James on behalf of Gulf Winds International Inc, Napa River Insurance Services. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/30/2019. (crt,Williams, L)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Napa River Insurance Services.(Attorney David Earl James added to party Napa River Insurance Services(pty:dft))(aty,James, David)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Gulf Winds International Inc.(Attorney David Earl James added to party Gulf Winds International Inc(pty:dft))(aty,James, David)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shelter Mutual Insurance Co. (aty,Wilkes, Gregg)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. The time allowed SHELTER MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY to file its answer, other responsive pleadings, or otherwise defend this action is extended for a period of thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 5/14/2019. (crt,Miletello, A)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer sent to Gregg A Wilkes on behalf of Shelter Mutual Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/28/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Shelter Mutual Insurance Co. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Gregg A Wilkes added to party Shelter Mutual Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Wilkes, Gregg)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to James K Grimes, Gulf Winds International Inc, Napa River Insurance Services, Shelter Mutual Insurance Co. (crt,Whidden, C)
April 12, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Whidden, C)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Napa River Insurance Services, Gulf Winds International Inc, James K Grimes, and Shelter Mutual Insurance Co (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3924286) filed by Jason Elliot. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Patrick R Jackson added to party Jason Elliot(pty:pet))(aty,Jackson, Patrick) Modified on 4/15/2019 to add defendants (Whidden, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliot v. Napa River Insurance Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Napa River Insurance Services
Represented By: Annie Jo Jacobs
Represented By: David Earl James
Represented By: Marianne Laine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Winds International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Co
Represented By: Gregg A Wilkes
Represented By: Jason Blance Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulf Winds International Inc
Represented By: Annie Jo Jacobs
Represented By: David Earl James
Represented By: Marianne Laine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James K Grimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Elliot
Represented By: Patrick R Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?