Harper v. Caddo Correctional Center et al

Plaintiff: Michael F Harper
Defendant: Medical Staff Caddo Correctional Center and Officer Owen
Case Number: 5:2019cv00480
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: IT IS RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff Michael Harper's #1 Complaint be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 7/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/8/2019. (crt,Leday, A)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint, within 30 days of the filing of this Order, to cure the deficiencies outlined. Plaintiff shall dismiss any claims that he is unable to cure through amendment. Plaintiff shall also notify the Court of any change in his address. Pro Se Response due by 6/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 5/9/2019. (crt,Leday, A)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $10.35. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 4/26/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
April 25, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER re #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Haik, K)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael F Harper. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to sign IFP application. Plaintiff submitted an IFP application not completed by an authorized Accounts Officer. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 5/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 4/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP application)(crt,Miletello, A)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). Application is not signed and completed by an authorized accounts officer at the facility in which the plaintiff is incarcerated. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 15, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 DEFICIENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael F Harper. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A).
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Medical Staff Caddo Correctional Center, Owen filed by Michael F Harper. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harper v. Caddo Correctional Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Staff Caddo Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael F Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?