405 Arapahoe L L C v. Monterey Resources L L C et al
Plaintiff: 405 Arapahoe LLC and 405 Arapahoe L L C
Defendant: Monterey Resources LLC, Green Wheel LLC, Monterey Resources L L C and Green Wheel L L C
Case Number: 5:2019cv00486
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying without prejudice for administrative purposes #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and #14 Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/14/2019. (crt,Reeves, T)
May 14, 2019 Filing 18 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by Green Wheel L L C, Monterey Resources L L C (Attachments: #1 xhibit A)(aty,Mintz, Mark) Modified on 5/15/2019 to capture more accurate event and edit text (JonesSld, P).
May 10, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT naming Arena Investors L P, Arena Investors G P L L C, Westaim Arena Holdings I I L L C, Westaim Clorp of America as other affiliates by 405 Arapahoe L L C. (aty,Naus, Roger) Modified on 5/10/2019 to add other affiliates (JonesSld, P).
May 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #14 MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,JonesSld, P)
May 8, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #14 Motion to Remand, sent to Roger Joseph Naus, John M Madison, Jr on behalf of 405 Arapahoe L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/22/2019. (crt,JonesSld, P)
May 7, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand by 405 Arapahoe L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Naus, Roger) Modified on 5/8/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).
May 1, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Green Wheel L L C, Monterey Resources L L C. (aty,Donald, Michael)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Tiffany Converse Rausch for Green Wheel L L C and Monterey Resources L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/30/2019. (crt,JonesSld, P)
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Tiffany Converse Raush to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3935816) by Green Wheel L L C, Monterey Resources L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Donald, Michael)
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby: Telephone STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/25/2019. Counsel for Plaintiff advised the court that they will file a motion to remand no later than May 7, 2019. Defendants' opposition is due by May 21, 2019. Plaintiff may file a reply by May 28, 2019. Counsel are reminded to provide a paper courtesy copy to chambers promptly after filing. Further scheduling related to the motion for preliminary injunction is deferred pending resolution of the jurisdictional issue. (crt,Keller, J)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Amy L Vazquez for Green Wheel L L C and Monterey Resources L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/26/2019. (crt,Keller, J)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Amy L. Vazquez to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3931663) by Green Wheel L L C, Monterey Resources L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Donald, Michael) Modified on 4/24/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/18/2019. (crt,JonesSld, P)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: A telephone status conference has been set in this case for April 25, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. Dial-in instructions will be emailed to all counsel of record. Trial counsel for each party must participate, and the use of cell phones is prohibited. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/17/2019. (crt,Stephens, M)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Mark A Mintz, Michael B Donald on behalf of Green Wheel L L C, Monterey Resources L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/1/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 16, 2019 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Section 9:5135 Request for Instructions by Green Wheel LLC, Monterey Resources LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A- Affidavit Imel, #3 Exhibit B- Credit Agreement, #4 Exhibit C- Order, #5 Exhibit D- Notice of Seizure, #6 Exhibit E- Mortgages, #7 Exhibit F- Affidavit of Verification, #8 Exhibit G-Certificate, #9 Exhibit H-Certificate, #10 Exhibit I-SOS Certificate)(aty,Donald, Michael) Modified on 4/18/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM for Injunctive Relief against 405 Arapahoe LLC by Green Wheel LLC, Monterey Resources LLC.(aty,Donald, Michael) Modified on 4/18/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 2nd JDC Claiborne Parish, Case Number 41744 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3926636) filed by Green Wheel LLC, Monterey Resources LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Part 1 of 3, #2 Exhibit 1 Part 2 of 3, #3 Exhibit 1 Part 3 of 3, #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Michael B Donald added to party Green Wheel LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael B Donald added to party Monterey Resources LLC (pty:dft))(aty,Donald, Michael) (Attachment 4 replaced on 4/17/2019) (Thigpen, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 405 Arapahoe L L C v. Monterey Resources L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monterey Resources LLC
Represented By: Michael B Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Wheel LLC
Represented By: Michael B Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monterey Resources L L C
Represented By: Amy L Vazquez
Represented By: Mark A Mintz
Represented By: Joshua A Norris
Represented By: Tiffany Converse Rausch
Represented By: Michael B Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Wheel L L C
Represented By: Amy L Vazquez
Represented By: Mark A Mintz
Represented By: Joshua A Norris
Represented By: Tiffany Converse Rausch
Represented By: Michael B Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 405 Arapahoe LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 405 Arapahoe L L C
Represented By: Roger Joseph Naus
Represented By: John M Madison, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?