Ball v. LeBlanc et al

Plaintiff: Alvin Ball
Defendant: LA Dept of Public Safety & Corrections, Jeremy Wallace, Lonnie Nail, Jerry Goodwin, Unknown Officers and James M LeBlanc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00613
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER from Plaintiff to Court requesting additional forms. Clerks sent requested forms on 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (crt,Haik, K)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER dated 6/14/2019 from Alvin Ball to Clerk of Court requesting status check. A copy of the docket sheet mailed on 7/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (crt,Williams, L)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Clerk is directed to serve plaintiff with two summons forms and one USM 285 form for each defendant to be completed by plaintiff and returned to clerk for service by U S Marshal. Clerk manually noticed order with forms. Pro Se Response due by 7/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/17/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. No initial filing fee due. Further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/6/2019. (crt,Williams, L)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,ThomasSld, T)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Jerry Goodwin, James M LeBlanc, Lonnie Nail, LA Dept of Public Safety & Corrections, Unknown Officers, Jeremy Wallace filed by Alvin Ball. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,ThomasSld, T)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 6/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint)(crt,ThomasSld, T)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 14, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 DISTRICT CASE transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:19-cv-00127. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Transferring Case to the Western District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 5/13/2019. (SWE) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 5/14/2019.]
February 26, 2019 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 5/14/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Alvin Ball. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 5/14/2019.]
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jerry Goodwin, James M. LeBlanc, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Lonnie Nail, Unknown Officers 1-3, Jeremy Wallace, filed by Alvin Ball. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(EDC) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 5/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ball v. LeBlanc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LA Dept of Public Safety & Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonnie Nail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?