Christmas v. Jackson et al

Plaintiff: Rayshawn J Christmas and Rayshaun J Christmas
Defendant: Capt Burn, Ms Hamilton, Dr Seal, Jeff Jackson, Sgt Reed and Pamela Hearn
Case Number: 5:2019cv00629
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST from Rayshawn J Christmas for status of case. Clerk mailed copy of docket sheet on 7/9/2019. (Public entry, but no electronic notice.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Burn, Hamilton, Pamela Hearn, Jeff Jackson, Reed, Seal. Clerk sent summonses, USM 285 forms, Clerk's notice to parties, docs. #1 , #4 & #5 to USM for service. Clerk forwarded plaintiff a copy of the docket sheet per request in cover letter. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter)(crt,Haik, K)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST from Rayshawn J Christmas for status of case. Clerk mailed copy of docket sheet on 6/10/2019. (Public entry, but no electronic notice.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (crt,ThomasSld, T)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Motion MOTION/Request for Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/5/2019. (crt,Williams, L)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION/Request for Production of Documents by Rayshawn J Christmas. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Williams, L)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Clerk is directed to serve plaintiff with two summons forms and one USM 285 form for each defendant to be completed by plaintiff and returned to clerk for service by U S Marshal. Clerk manually noticed order with forms. Pro Se Response due by 6/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/28/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $5.67. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/21/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 15, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rayshawn J Christmas. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Burn, Hamilton, Pamela Hearn, Jeff Jackson, Reed, Seal filed by Rayshawn J Christmas. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Letter, #4 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christmas v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rayshawn J Christmas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rayshaun J Christmas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt Burn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?