Carter v. Vannoy
Plaintiff: Ervin Carter
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Case Number: 5:2019cv00634
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 DISTRICT COURT TRANSFER Record Received electronically by Eastern District of Louisiana on 6/14/2019, assigned case number 2:19-cv-11219. (crt,Whidden, C)
June 10, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from Western District of Louisiana to Eastern District of Louisiana. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Haik, K)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court TRANSFER the above captioned case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana, the district in which the alleged cause of action arose. Petitioner's motion to transfer [Doc. 4] is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/10/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER/MOTION to Transfer Case by Ervin Carter. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Williams, L)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 6/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 ifp form)(crt,Haik, K)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/21/2019) (Thigpen, M).
May 16, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ervin Carter. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibits)(crt,Devillier, W)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ervin Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?