Johnson v. Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C
Plaintiff: Burl J. Johnson, Jr. and Burl J Johnson, Jr
Defendant: Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC and Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C
Case Number: 5:2019cv00889
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Kristen B Bernard of Dudley DeBosier Injury Lawyers is enrolled as additional counsel of record for plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/4/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 at 9:00 AM in Shreveport, Courtroom 2 before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2020 11:00 AM in chambers before Judge Elizabeth E Foote. Pretrial Order due by 7/9/2020. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 11/3/2019. Plaintiffs Witness List due by 1/15/2020. Defendant's witness list is due seven (7) days after receipt of plaintiff's list. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 3/15/2020. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 4/15/2020. Discovery deadline 3/15/2020. Compel discovery 3/15/2020. Expert Depositions due by 5/15/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2020. Daubert Motions due by 6/5/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order inserts and exhibits exchanged by 6/4/2020. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 6/18/2020. Motions in Limine due by 7/9/2020. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 7/27/2020. Electronic Exhibits due by 8/10/2020. Trial Depositions due by 8/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/3/2019. (crt,Keller, J)
August 30, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Kristen B. Bernard to Enroll as Counsel by Burl J Johnson, Jr. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Kristen Brazzel Bernard added to party Burl J Johnson, Jr(pty:pla))(aty,Bernard, Kristen)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John David Shepherd, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/28/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw J. David Shepherd as Attorney by Burl J Johnson, Jr. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Savoie, Gerald)
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 26(f) Report by Burl J Johnson, Jr and Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. (aty,Savoie, Gerald) Modified filers on 8/27/2019 (Bunting, M).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. If Plaintiff intended for Mr. Shepherd to withdraw, he should submit a motion and order to that effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/21/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Certificate of Consent filed by Burl J Johnson, Jr regarding #10 MOTION to Substitute Attorney . (aty,Savoie, Gerald)
August 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Deficiency to Gerald Adam Savoie on behalf of Burl J Johnson, Jr regarding #10 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Reason: A motion to withdraw or to substitute counsel must be signed by or have consent of the withdrawing attorney. Please refer to LR83.2.11. See also LR5.7.08 regarding electronic filing of documents requiring signatures of more than one party. The motion cannot be referred to chambers until this deficiency is corrected. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Enroll as Co-Counsel by Burl J Johnson, Jr. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Gerald Adam Savoie added to party Burl J Johnson, Jr(pty:pla))(aty,Savoie, Gerald) Modified event to more accurately describe document filed and to reflect deficient status on 8/20/2019 (Bunting, M). Modified to remove deficient status on 8/20/2019 (Bunting, M). See document #12 for Certificate of Consent. Modified event on 8/21/2019 (Bunting, M).
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) Report by Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C and Burl J Johnson, Jr. (aty,Melville, Charles) Modified filers on 8/15/2019 (Bunting, M).
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C, Wal-Mart Stores Inc identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East L P, Corporate Parent W S E Management L L C, Corporate Parent W S E Investment L L C, Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East L L C, Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores Inc for Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C . (aty,Melville, Charles) Modifiedto correct corporate parent on 7/23/2019 (Bunting, M).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2019 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place by 8/20/2019. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 8/27/2019. Rule 26 Report due by 8/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/16/2019. (crt,Keifer, K)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C.(aty,Melville, Charles)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/15/2019. (crt,Roaix, G)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/15/2019. (crt,Stephens, M)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Mitchell, P)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Charles Taunton Melville on behalf of Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/26/2019. (crt,Mitchell, P)
July 11, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed in the 1st JDC, Parish of Caddo. Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C answer due 7/18/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #2 to Document #1 . (crt,Mitchell, P)
July 11, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Mitchell, P)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 616,699 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3995239) filed by Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Attorney Charles Taunton Melville added to party Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Melville, Charles) (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/12/2019 with redacted version) (Dunford, T).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: Charles Taunton Melville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Louisiana L L C
Represented By: Charles Taunton Melville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burl J. Johnson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burl J Johnson, Jr
Represented By: Gerald Adam Savoie
Represented By: Kristen Brazzel Bernard
Represented By: John David Shepherd, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?