Ashton v. P J Louisiana Inc
Plaintiff: Le Latonya Ashton
Defendant: P J Louisiana L L C and P J Louisiana Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00901
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #10 MOTION for Confirmation of Arbitration Awards. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Dunford, T)
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Confirmation of Arbitration Awards by Le Latonya Ashton. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Confirm Arbitration Awards, #2 Exhibit Exhbiit 1 - Arbitrator's Summary Judgment Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Arbitrator's Interim Award, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Aribtrator's Final Award, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Arbitration Program and Agreement, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Arbitrator's Hearing Transcript, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Claimant's Post-Hearing Brief, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Respondent's Post-Hearing Brief, #9 Exhibit Exhbiit 8 - Claimant's Post-Hearing Reply Brief, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Claimant's Fee & Cost Application, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - Respondent's Oppositiont to Fee & Cost Application, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - Claimant's Fee & Cost Reply Brief)(aty,Potashnick, Mark) Modified text on 8/30/2019 (Dunford, T).
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by P J Louisiana Inc identifying Corporate Parent P J United Inc for P J Louisiana Inc. (aty,Devillier, Carroll) Modified text on 8/30/2019 (Dunford, T).
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #7 Answer to Complaint sent to Carroll Devillier, Jr on behalf of P J Louisiana Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/12/2019. (crt,Dunford, T)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses to Confirm Arbitration Awards by P J Louisiana Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Attorney Carroll Devillier, Jr added to party P J Louisiana Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Devillier, Carroll)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service via email for Summons and Complaint with Exhibits served on William Hancock, Attorney for Defendant PJ Louisiana, Inc. on July 18, 2019, filed by Le Latonya Ashton. (aty,Potashnick, Mark) Modified text on 8/27/2019 (Dunford, T).
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint, by Le Latonya Ashton. (aty,Jefferson, Stephen)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Mark A Potashnick for Le Latonya Ashton. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/18/2019. (crt,Leday, A)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Mark Potashnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3999776) by Le Latonya Ashton. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (aty,Jefferson, Stephen) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/17/2019 to correct orientation and modified docket text to indicate proposed order and Certificate of Good Standing included within pdf of main document.) (Crick, S).
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to P J Louisiana Inc (crt,Crick, S)
July 15, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Crick, S)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against P J Louisiana Inc (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3997222) filed by Le Latonya Ashton. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Stephen A Jefferson added to party Le Latonya Ashton(pty:pla))(aty,Jefferson, Stephen) (Main Document 1 and attachment replaced to correct orientation, docket text modified on 7/16/2019) (Crick, S). ( Modified on 7/19/2019 to indicate #5 Exhibit inadvertently omitted from complaint submitted as separate document. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashton v. P J Louisiana Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Le Latonya Ashton
Represented By: Stephen A Jefferson
Represented By: Mark A Potashnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P J Louisiana L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P J Louisiana Inc
Represented By: Carroll Devillier, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?