Harvey v. Walmart Inc
Plaintiff: Bernadine Harvey
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00906
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: At the request of the parties, the scheduling conference originally set for 9/11/19 has been reset for 9/19/19 at 10:00 a.m. in chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/9/2019. (crt,Stephens, M)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: Due to a court conflict, the Scheduling Conference originally set for 9/5/19 has been reset for 9/11/2019 at 10:30 AM in chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/4/2019. (crt,Stephens, M)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) Report by Bernadine Harvey, Walmart Inc. (aty,Bernard, Kristen) Modified on 8/29/2019 to add filer (JonesSld, P).
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Walmart Inc . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Wynn, Timothy)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 8/22/2019. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 8/29/2019. Rule 26 Report due by 8/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/17/2019. (crt,Keller, J)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/17/2019. (crt,JonesSld, P)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/17/2019. (crt,Stephens, M)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 16, 2019 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 16, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Walmart Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #1 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walmart Inc. (aty,Wynn, Timothy)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Walmart Inc. (aty,Wynn, Timothy)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 611,285-C with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3997623) filed by Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Attorney Timothy Russell Wynn added to party Walmart Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Wynn, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvey v. Walmart Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Timothy Russell Wynn
Represented By: Scott R Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadine Harvey
Represented By: W Paul Wilkins
Represented By: Kristen Brazzel Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?