Woods v. Zips Car Wash L L C
Plaintiff: Andre Woods
Defendant: Zips Car Wash, LLC and Zips Car Wash L L C
Case Number: 5:2019cv00935
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Zips Car Wash L L C . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(aty,Cancienne, Phyllis)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2019 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 9/10/2019. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 9/17/2019. Rule 26 Report due by 9/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/9/2019. (crt,Keller, J)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/9/2019. (crt,Stephens, M)
August 5, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Zips Car Wash L L C. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, (Amended Notice of Removal). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(aty,Cancienne, Phyllis)
July 26, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Zips Car Wash L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture filing event located within PDF image of #10 Answer to complaint. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zips Car Wash L L C. (aty,Cancienne, Phyllis)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Zips Car Wash L L C.(aty,Cancienne, Phyllis)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Zips Car Wash, LLC will need to file, no later than August 5, 2019, an amended notice of removal that specifically alleges the citizenship of every member of Zips in accordance with the rules outlined above. ( Compliance Deadline set for 8/5/2019.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/24/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of J Bruce Cross for Zips Car Wash L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/22/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Mary E Buckley for Zips Car Wash L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/22/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/22/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for J. Bruce Cross to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4002559) by Zips Car Wash, LLC. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Cancienne, Phyllis)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Mary E. Buckley to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4002532) by Zips Car Wash, LLC. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Cancienne, Phyllis)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Phyllis Guin Cancienne, Elizabeth Ann Liner on behalf of Zips Car Wash, LLC. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/2/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 19, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from First Judicial Court, Caddo Parish, Case Number 617,040-C (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4002258) filed by Zips Car Wash, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A- Affidavit, #3 Exhibit B-Petition, #4 Exhibit C-Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Attorney Phyllis Guin Cancienne added to party Zips Car Wash, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Cancienne, Phyllis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Zips Car Wash L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zips Car Wash, LLC
Represented By: Phyllis Guin Cancienne
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Liner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zips Car Wash L L C
Represented By: Phyllis Guin Cancienne
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Liner
Represented By: Mary E Buckley
Represented By: J Bruce Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Woods
Represented By: Robert B Dunlap, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?