Francis v. Lafayette Parish
Plaintiff: **Sanctioned/Barred* Maureen Francis
Defendant: School System of Lafayette Parish
Case Number: 5:2019cv00958
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #1 Motion for Permission to Proceed with My Case and the Clerk of Court is ordered to strike this matter from the records and close this case. FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Appointment of Counsel is denied. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 8/19/2019. (crt,McDonnell, D)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maureen Francis re #1 MOTION for Leave to File /Permission to Proceed With My Case with Incorporated Complaint (crt,JonesSld, P)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maureen Francis re #1 MOTION for Leave to File /Permission to Proceed With My Case with Incorporated Complaint (crt,Williams, L)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Motion for Leave to file Complaint and Motion for Appointment of Counsel referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks Jr. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Mitchell, P)
July 23, 2019 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 23, 2019 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 6:19-cv-0958 from Lafayette Division to Shreveport Division. New Case Number 5:19-cv-0958. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 STRICKEN. MOTION for Permission to Proceed With Case with incorporated Complaint by Maureen Francis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Exhibits Part 1, #3 Proposed Exhibits Part 2, #4 Proposed Exhibits Part 3, #5 Proposed Exhibits Part 4, #6 Proposed Exhibits Part 5, #7 Proposed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #8 Proposed Motion for Appointment of Counsel, #9 Text of proposed order)(crt,Devillier, W). Modified on 8/20/2019 to indicate stricken. See #5 Order. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francis v. Lafayette Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: **Sanctioned/Barred* Maureen Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: School System of Lafayette Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?