Calvin v. Circle K Convenience Store Co
Plaintiff: Janice Calvin
Defendant: Circle K Convenience Store Co and Circle K Stores Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv00962
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Janice Calvin. Circle K Convenience Store Co waiver sent on 8/27/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (aty,Cameron, Nelson)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Circle K Convenience Store Co. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/29/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C) Modified on 7/30/2019 to correctly reflect "signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby" (Dauterive, C).
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/29/2019. (crt,Stephens, M)
July 25, 2019 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Williams, L)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Janice Calvin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Cameron, Nelson)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Circle K Convenience Store Company a/k/a Circle K Stores, Inc. d/b/a Circle K with Jury Demand (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Janice Calvin. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Nelson Welch Cameron added to party Janice Calvin(pty:pla))(aty,Cameron, Nelson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calvin v. Circle K Convenience Store Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Calvin
Represented By: Nelson Welch Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circle K Convenience Store Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circle K Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?