Moore v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Frances Jean Moore
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2019cv00987
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding #6 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. Action taken: docket entry modified to correct answer due date to 11/27/2019. (crt,Williams, L)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frances Jean Moore; Social Security Administration served on 8/29/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (crt,Dunford, T) Modified on 9/23/2019 to correct answer due date(Williams, L).
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security (crt,Leday, A)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/1/2019. (crt,Leday, A)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 29, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frances Jean Moore. (crt,Miletello, A)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration filed by Frances Jean Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Jean Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?