Bugg DeSoto L L C v. Chesapeake Operating L L C
Plaintiff: Bugg DeSoto L L C
Defendant: Chesapeake Operating L L C
Case Number: 5:2019cv01049
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: S Maurice Hicks
2 Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #9 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Responses due by 10/25/2019 Replies due by 11/1/2019. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/30/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 27, 2019 Motions Transferred regarding #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim with consent . Motions referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim with consent by Bugg DeSoto L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,O'Neal, Anna)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Tiffany C Raush for Chesapeake Operating L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/26/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Tiffany C. Raush to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-4058112) by Chesapeake Operating L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(aty,Duarte, Nicole) Modified docket text on 9/25/2019 (Bunting, M).
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. In accordance with Standing Order 1.62, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. Judge Elizabeth E Foote no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment.(crt,Whidden, C)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Referred to Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 9/16/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #9 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chesapeake Operating L L C. (aty,Duarte, Nicole)
September 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Chesapeake Operating L L C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief in Support of Motion for Partial Dismissal)(Attorney Nicole M Duarte added to party Chesapeake Operating L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Duarte, Nicole)
August 19, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bugg DeSoto L L C. (aty,O'Neal, Anna)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/19/2019. (crt,Stephens, M)
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chesapeake Operating L L C filed by Bugg DeSoto L L C.(aty,O'Neal, Anna) Modified docket text on 8/19/2019 (Bunting, M).
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER: To establish diversity jurisdiction, plaintiff must file an amended complaint by 8/28/2019 that specifically alleges the citizenship of Bugg DeSoto. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/14/2019. (crt,Dunford, T)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bugg DeSoto L L C. Chesapeake Operating L L C served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/4/2019. (aty,O'Neal, Anna)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint,, sent to Anna W O'Neal on behalf of Bugg DeSoto L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/27/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chesapeake Operating L L C (crt,Bunting, M)
August 13, 2019 Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby added. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chesapeake Operating L L C (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4022352) filed by Bugg DeSoto L L C. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Anna W O'Neal added to party Bugg DeSoto L L C (pty:pla))(aty,O'Neal, Anna) Modified on 8/13/2019 (Bunting, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bugg DeSoto L L C v. Chesapeake Operating L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Operating L L C
Represented By: Nicole M Duarte
Represented By: Tiffany C Raush
Represented By: Joshua A Norris
Represented By: David K McCrory
Represented By: Patrick Stephen Ottinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bugg DeSoto L L C
Represented By: Scott Joseph Privat
Represented By: Kenneth O Privat
Represented By: Anna W O'Neal
Represented By: Roger Joseph Naus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?