Kitchen v. Walk-Ons Bistreaux & Bar
Plaintiff: Michael Lee Kitchen
Defendant: Walk-Ons Bistreaux and Bar
Case Number: 5:2019cv01062
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Michael Lee Kitchen and required service of summons and complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/21/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Walk-Ons Bistreaux and Bar (crt,Dauterive, C)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/16/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 14, 2019 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Lee Kitchen. (crt,Miletello, A)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Walk-Ons Bistreaux and Bar filed by Michael Lee Kitchen. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kitchen v. Walk-Ons Bistreaux & Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walk-Ons Bistreaux and Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lee Kitchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?