Lee v. Patterson et al
Plaintiff: Leona Lee
Defendant: D'Jondre Patterson, Napa River Insurance Services, Hornady Transportation, LLC, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co and Hornady Transportation L L C
Case Number: 5:2019cv01104
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding #11 Case Management Order. Action taken: Order marked issued in error. Replacement Order issued 10/1/19. See #13 Case Management Order. (crt,Crawford, A)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 10/22/2019. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 10/1/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hornady Transportation L L C, Napa River Insurance Services, D'Jondre Patterson.(aty,Schroeter, David)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 **ISSUED IN ERROR**CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 10/11/2019. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 9/20/2019. (crt,Crawford, A) Modified on 10/17/2019 to reflect order issued in error. (Crawford, A)
September 20, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as pleading filed within pdf of attachment to 10 Response to Removal Order(Attorney Thomas A Bordelon added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co(pty:dft))(crt,JonesSld, P)
September 20, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Napa River Insurance Services answer due 8/29/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as pleading filed within pdf of attachment to #10 Response to Removal Order. (crt,JonesSld, P)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Hornady Transportation L L C, Napa River Insurance Services, D'Jondre Patterson of List of Parties and Pleadings re #7 Removal Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Schroeter, David) Modified on 9/20/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Napa River Insurance Services identifying Corporate Parent Hudson Insurance Company for Napa River Insurance Services. (aty,Schroeter, David)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hornady Transportation L L C identifying Corporate Parent Hornady Truck Line, Inc., Corporate Parent Daseke Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Daseke, Inc. for Hornady Transportation L L C. (aty,Schroeter, David)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/23/2019. (crt,JonesSld, P)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/23/2019. (crt,Stephens, M)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 22, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to David Mark Schroeter, Milton Davis Ready on behalf of Hornady Transportation, LLC, Napa River Insurance Services. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/5/2019. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Hornady Transportation, LLC, Napa River Insurance Services, D'Jondre Patterson of to Plaintiff re #1 Notice of Removal (aty,Ready, Milton)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Hornady Transportation, LLC, Napa River Insurance Services, D'Jondre Patterson of Removal (State Court) re #1 Notice of Removal (aty,Ready, Milton)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st Judicial District Court, Case Number 617825 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4031247) filed by Napa River Insurance Services, Hornady Transportation, LLC, D'Jondre Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Milton Davis Ready added to party Hornady Transportation, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Milton Davis Ready added to party Napa River Insurance Services(pty:dft), Attorney Milton Davis Ready added to party D'Jondre Patterson(pty:dft))(aty,Ready, Milton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Patterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D'Jondre Patterson
Represented By: Milton Davis Ready
Represented By: David Mark Schroeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Napa River Insurance Services
Represented By: Milton Davis Ready
Represented By: David Mark Schroeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hornady Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Milton Davis Ready
Represented By: David Mark Schroeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co
Represented By: Thomas A Bordelon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hornady Transportation L L C
Represented By: Milton Davis Ready
Represented By: David Mark Schroeter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leona Lee
Represented By: Geya Dawn Prudhomme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?